Freeze v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Matthew Freeze
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2011cv00005
Filed: January 11, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 33 Motion for Relief from Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/11. (vjt)
June 15, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re pltf's 23 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order 20 and Judgment 21 dismissing this action, because he did not exhaust his administrative remedies, he is not entitled to maintain an action in federal court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/11. (vjt)
June 13, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting petitioner's 27 Motion for Leave to File a Reply; the Clerk is directed to file the attachment to his motion as his reply. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/13/11. (vjt)
April 13, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 20 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas petition without prejudice because Freeze has not exhausted his administrative remedies. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/13/11. (vjt)
February 7, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO filed by Matthew Freeze is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeze v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Freeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?