Chandler v. L'Oreal USA Inc et al

Plaintiff: LaKesia Chandler
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc, L'Oreal USA Products Inc and Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv00011
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 43 Order entered this date, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/11. (vjt)
May 10, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Amend; Chandler may amend to substitute the outrage claim and demand a jury by 20 May 2011; granting without prejudice 22 Wal-Mart's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/10/2011. (mkf)
March 29, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part & denying in part 20 MOTION to Clarify filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Considering all the material circumstances, the Court comes to these conclusions: Wal-Mart remains a party; Wal-Mart's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 4/8/2011. The Court looks forward to all the parties' responses to the motion to amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/29/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. L'Oreal USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaKesia Chandler
Represented By: Kevin Kelley
Represented By: Britt Cannon Johnson
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine Gerhard Baker
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products Inc
Represented By: Kristine Gerhard Baker
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?