Williams v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Plaintiff: Frankie Williams
Defendant: Don Ball, Correctional Medical Services, Wendy L Kelly, Dottie Yarbrough, Burl, Ray Hobbs and Joseph Edward Hughs
Case Number: 2:2011cv00053
Filed: March 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JUDGMENT : Consistent with the order entered today, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/13/12. (hph)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: If plaintiff wishes to be heard on 48 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, he should file a Response within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/14/2012. (srw)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Joe J Volpe's proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; granting 16 Joseph Hughes and Don Ball's motion to dismiss; dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's allegations against defendants Hughes and Ball; denying Defendants' request for attorneys fees and costs; and denying as moot 30 Defendants' second motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/12/11. (hph)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 8 proposed findings and recommended partial disposition and dismissing defts Correctional Medical Services and Dottie Yarbrough from this action for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/11. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dottie Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Edward Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?