Glaze et al v. Forrest City Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Makielah Glaze and Cedric Glaze
Defendant: Forrest City Police Department, Dwight Duch, Edgar Moore, Robin Ivey, McCoy, Alan Cline, Steve Routon, Jonnie Jones, Forrest City Arkansas, City of and Helen Rhodes
Case Number: 2:2011cv00082
Filed: April 25, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 90 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; pltfs' claims are dismissed with prejudice, with the exception of the state law claims, which are dismissed without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/14/12. (vjt)
May 1, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to submit the $350 filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP Application (enclosed), no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/1/12. (vjt)
February 22, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward a document, which appears to be a declaration from a non-party, to pltf's counsel without filing it, and to send pltf a copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/12. (vjt)
November 15, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltfs' 33 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Ruben Ivey. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/15/11. (vjt)
November 14, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Ruben Ivey's Motion to Withdraw his response to the motion for default judgment 34 ; a substituted response may be filed within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/11. (vjt)
October 19, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/19/11. (vjt)
October 11, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to remove the address of Makielah Glaze from the docket sheet. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/11/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaze et al v. Forrest City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makielah Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Duch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Routon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonnie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest City Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?