Hicks v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Hicks
Defendant: Juanita Stell, Joe Hughes, Marybeth Floyd, Jerre Douglas, Ray Hobbs, Larry May, Gorden, Holloway, Sharon King, Bogan, Todd Ball, Tate, Harrell and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 2:2011cv00085
Filed: April 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf shall file a notice of his intent to continue with the prosecution of this case as directed within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/24/12. (vjt)
January 31, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 Partial Report and Recommendations and deismissing pltf's claims against deft Ruthie Bernice Tate without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/31/12. (kpr)
December 16, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 70 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against deft Walter Holloway without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/16/11. (kpr)
October 12, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety 59 Partial Recommended Disposition; dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Crowell without prejudice; and, removing Crowell's name as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/12/2011. (dmn)
September 15, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Walter Holloway (originally sued as Holloway); the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint 2 18 , and this Order on deft Holloway (ADDRESS UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/15/11. (vjt)
August 9, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaints 2 18 , and this Order on defts Holloway, Stell, and Gorden, in care of counsel for the prison's medical contractor, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/9/11. (vjt)
August 2, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 Partial Report and Recommendations and allowing plaintiff to proceed against defts Wendy Kelley, Gorden, Holloway, Sharon King, Tate, Harrell, Juanita Stell, Joe Hughes, Floyd, Douglas, Anderson, Rectenwald, and Crowell. All of pltf's claims are dismissed without prejudice against defts Ray Hobbs, Larry May, Todd Ball, and Bogan. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/2/11. (kpr)
July 18, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 9 Motion to Amend Complaint to add defts Anderson, Rectenwald, and Crowell; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, amended complaint 9 , and this Order on defts Kelley, Gorden, Holloway, King, Tate, Harrell, Stell, Hughes, Floyd, Douglas, Anderson, Rectenwald, and Crowell, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/18/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Stell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marybeth Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerre Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?