Luttrell v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Charles Ray Luttrell
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2011cv00097
Filed: June 1, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/7/12. (hph)
November 10, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 65 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 51 Motion for Hearing and 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/11. (kpr)
October 12, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 40 Judge Deere's Partial Recommended Disposition; denying 9 , 10 , 13 , 18 , and 33 Motions; and, directing the Clerk to file 17 Luttrell's objection, as his amended complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luttrell v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ray Luttrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?