Dean v. Helena Chemical Company

Plaintiff: Russ Dean
Defendant: Helena Chemical Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv00105
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 88 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA filed by Helena Chemical Company is GRANTED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/28/12. (vjt)
July 31, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 73 Motion to Quash the subpoena issued to Arkansas County Bank; granting 86 Motion to Compel the deposition of Dr. Timothy Walker. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/12. (vjt)
March 15, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Helena Chemical Company's 21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on RM Dean Farms' claim under the Arkansas Deceptive Trade Practices Act (Count II) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/15/12. (vjt)
January 19, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information, granting deft's 34 MOTION for Protective Order; the 30(b)(6) notice of RM Dean Farms is stricken, except for topics 2,6,43,52,59,63,69, and 70; the motion for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/19/12. (vjt)
January 17, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 34 Motion to Shorten Response Time re 34 Motion for Protective Order; pltf's response is due by no later than close of business on Wednesday, January 18, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/17/12. (vjt)
November 1, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting pltf's 11 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; pltf's amended complaint must be filed within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/1/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Helena Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Dean
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Brian A. Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?