Conery/Malik v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Conery/Malik
Defendant: Moses Jackson, III and Lathan Ester
Case Number: 2:2011cv00123
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the order entered today, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/31/12. (hph)
May 24, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to deft's 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment within ten days of the date of this Order or risk dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/24/12. (kpr)
October 4, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting ddls. Discovery due by 4/3/2012, Motions due by 5/3/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/4/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conery/Malik v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Conery/Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lathan Ester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?