Amerson v. Outlaw et al

Plaintiff: Marvin Amerson
Defendant: Ronald Smith and T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2011cv00130
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 123 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' motions for summary judgment 83 119 are granted and pltf's claims against defts Reynolds, Trigg, Outlaw, and Smith are dismissed with prejudice; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/22/13. (vjt)
October 15, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING and approving 85 the proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety in all respects; and denying 76 Mr. Amerson's motion for to class certification. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/15/2012. (kdr)
October 12, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion to Stay discovery; granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to motion to dismiss. The reply is due within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/12/12. (kpr)
May 24, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting the Discovery ddl for 11/22/2012, and setting the Motions ddl for 12/22/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/24/12. (kpr)
May 4, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety in all respects the 44 proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting in part 34 Defendants motion to dismiss, with respect to plaintiff's FTCA, Fourteenth Amendment, and APA claims; dismissing Defendants Maldonado and Watts; and dismissing 34 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with respect to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims against Defendants Outlaw and Smith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/4/2012. (kdr)
May 1, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/1/12. (kpr)
January 23, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons on deft Gerald Maldonado and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and amended complaint on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/23/12. (kpr)
December 15, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to provide the Court the last-known address of deft Marvin Anderson, under seal, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/15/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerson v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Amerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?