Bradley v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Cory Deontra Bradley
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2011cv00153
Filed: August 29, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 MOTION for Protective Order, which the Court characterizes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Cory Deontra Bradley. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/18/12. (kpr)
May 10, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and denying 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/10/2012. (kcs)
January 3, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition; adding Officer Meadows, Nurse Wyatt, Psychologist Spitz, and United States as Defendants; dismissing all other claims and Defendants, without prejudice, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendants Meadows, Nurse Wyatt, Psychologist Spitz, and the United States. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/3/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Deontra Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?