Williams et al v. Marvell, City of et al

Plaintiff: John Does and Al M Williams
Defendant: Wallace, Jeremy Henson, David Lawman, Phillips County Sheriff Department, James Bell, Lonnie Whitfield, Ruben Robinson, Ronnie White, Timothy Harris, Marvell, City of, Helena Regional Medical Center, Arthur Levy, Phillips County and Does
Case Number: 2:2011cv00210
Filed: November 16, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 145 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 132 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and pltf's claims against Harris, Wallace, and the City of Marvell, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/13/12. (vjt)
August 28, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward pltf's pro se motion for reconsideration to pltf's attorney without filing it; and to send pltf a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/28/12. (vjt)
August 27, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that any objections to 108 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS must be filed no later than 14 days after the entry date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/27/12. (vjt)
August 20, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 118 Order Adopting Partial Report and Recommendations; Objections to R&R due 8/23/12. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/20/12. (vjt)
August 13, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 108 ; denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/13/2012. (pag)
August 2, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 100 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/2/12. (vjt)
June 22, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 79 Partial Report and Recommendations; denying Defendants Michael Harris, City of Marvell, and Uless Wallace 55 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/22/2012. (pag)
April 11, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to respond to defts' 55 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint and this Order on deft Phillips County without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/11/12. (vjt)
February 24, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against deft Arthur Levy are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and pltf's claims against the Phillips County Sheriff Department and the Helena Reg ional Medical Center are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; pltf is allowed to proceed with claims listed in this Order; pltf's motions for class action status, and to consolidate 5 6 are DENIED; the names of the John Does are removed as party pltfs; Phillips County Sheriff Department, John Does and Helena Regional Medical Center terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/24/12. (vjt)
February 22, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 26 Partial Report and Recommendations, and denying 24 and 25 Plaintiff's Motions for Relief. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/22/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Marvell, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lawman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?