Logan v. May et al
Plaintiff: Rick Logan
Defendant: Cottrell, Lau, Minor, McCullough, Stewart and Edwards
Case Number: 2:2012cv00007
Filed: January 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Presiding Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting defts' 85 MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY until the defts' 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment can be decided. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/9/12. (vjt)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/20/12. (kpr)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING 42 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rick Logan. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/24/12. (kpr)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Albert Kittrell; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on deft Kittrell without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/12/12. (vjt)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Peter Edwards; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on defts Edwards (ADDRESS UNDER SEAL), Cottrell and Lau in care of the ADC, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/24/12. (vjt)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing defts to respond to pltf's 7 Request for Injunctive Relief, which the Court will treat as a Motion, no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/21/12. (vjt)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing with prejudice pltf's claims against all defts except Cottrell, Lau, Minor, McCullough, Stewart, and Edwards. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/31/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?