Hooper v. Corizon Inc et al

Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Defendant: Does, Corizon Inc, Gordon and Joseph Hughes
Case Number: 2:2012cv00047
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 63 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 56 Defendant's motion for summary judgment; and dismissing this case, without prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/30/2013. (kdr)
November 5, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/05/2012. (kcs)
June 11, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; dismissing Defendants Gordon, Hughes, and Corizon without prejudice; and giving Plaintiff 90 days to file an amended complaint containing the names of and the service addresses for the Doe Defendants. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/11/12. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper v. Corizon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?