Hooper v. Jamison et al

Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Defendant: Wesley Jamison, Marion Smith, Wallace McNary and Brenda Perry
Case Number: 2:2012cv00048
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Marion Smith, Wesley Jamison against Danny Lee Hooper and plaintiff's 2 complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/29/2015. (ks)
June 12, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward the document received from plaintiff objecting to certain orders and filings in this case back to plaintiff without filing it. Plaintiff is represented by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 6/12/13. (kpr)
March 26, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 43 Partial Report and Recommendations and allowing plaintiff to proceed to jury trial on his claims against defts Wesley Jamison and Marion Smith. Plaintiff's claims against defts Wallace McNary and Brenda Perry are dismissed with prejudice and they are removed as party defts.. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/26/13. (kpr)
July 31, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/31/12. (vjt)
May 17, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 5 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/17/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper v. Jamison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace McNary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?