Chestang v. Robinson et al

Plaintiff: KeOndra M Chestang
Defendant: R A Robinson, Decoursey and Greg Harmon
Case Number: 2:2012cv00055
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Ruben Robinson against KeOndra M Chestang. The complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/25/2014. (ks) (Docket text modified on 3/25/2014 to correct the signature date.) (thd).
March 11, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The final scheduling order set this matter for jury trial sometime during the week of March 24, 2014, in Little Rock, Arkansas. The Court has determined that the jury trial will begin at 9:15 A.M. on Monday, March 24, 2014, in Courtroom #4-D, Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. Counsel should be present by 8:30a.m. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/11/2014. (ks)
March 11, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 49 Report and Recommendations; defts' 43 motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part; Robinson's motion for summary judgment on the claims against him in his individual capacit y is denied; pltf's claims against Robinson and Harmon in their official capacities are dismissed, as are pltf's claims against Harmon in his individual capacity; CASE IS REFERRED BACK to Magistrate Judge H. David Young. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/11/13. (vjt)
August 14, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's claims against deft Decoursey are dismissed without prejudice; Steven Decoursey terminated. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/14/12. (vjt)
May 3, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by KeOndra M Chestang. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Steven Decoursey. The Clerk shall prepare summons for Decoursey, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on Decoursey, at the sealed address provided, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/3/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestang v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeOndra M Chestang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R A Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decoursey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?