Austin v. Long

Plaintiff: Gary V Austin
Defendant: Fletcher Long
Case Number: 2:2012cv00076
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's 20 amended complaint with prejudice, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. If any party desires to make the terms of settlement a part of the record herein, those terms should be reduced to writing and filed with the court within 30 days from the file date of this order. The court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon cause shown that settlement has not been completed and that a party wishes this court to enforce thesettlement agreement specifically. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 6/11/2015. (ks) (Docket text modified on 6/11/2015 to correct a typographical error). (jak)
August 21, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 45 , 47 , and 50 Defendant's Motions in Limine and granting 69 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Regina Haralson is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 8/21/2014. (thd) (Docket text modified on 8/21/2014 to correct a typographical error.)(thd).
May 9, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 63 Notice of Appeal filed by Fletcher Long. The Court orders a stay of proceedings including the 6/2/2014 trial pending the Eighth Circuit's ruling. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 5/9/2014. (fcd)
December 30, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/13. (kpr)
March 14, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary V Austin
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fletcher Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?