Tayborn v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Tayborn, III
Defendant: Does, Wendy Kelly, Don Ball, Geraldine Campbell and Denise Strickland
Case Number: 2:2012cv00102
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 Report and Recommendations; therefore, deft Wendy Kelley's Motion for Sanctions 36 is granted to the extent that pltf's claims against her are dismissed without prejudice; pltf's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/22/13. (vjt)
January 23, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 33 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge H. David Young. Plaintiff's claims against Denise Strickland, Don Ball, and Geraldine Campbell are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/23/2013. (mcz)
September 21, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 25 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Wendy Kelley's Motion to Dismiss 18 is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/12. (vjt)
July 30, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response, no later than 14 days after the entry date of this Order, to 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wendy Kelley. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/30/12. (vjt)
June 28, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Don Ball; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint, and this Order on deft Ball (ADDRESS UNDER SEAL) without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 6/28/12. (vjt)
June 4, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to submit, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, the names of any Doe Defendants, along with a short statement of his claims against each. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 6/4/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tayborn v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Campbell
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Strickland
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Tayborn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?