Flaherty v. Cox et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Steven Flaherty
Defendant: Avery G Cox and Tyrone L Washington
Case Number: 2:2012cv00103
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Pursuant to an oral request for Order Re: General Order 54 filed by the Defendant, the request is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/20/2013. (kcs)
August 6, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, on 7/31/2013 the Court entered an Order granting Plaintiff's request to call as witnesses former Supervisor Tryone Washington, Sergeant Tammy Daniel, Deputy Warden Richard Todd Ball and Wallace McNairy. See docket entry # 52 . The Court will therefore allow the Plaintiff to call and question former Supervisor Washington and Deputy Warden Ball on the ADC policy on removing "high risk" prisoners from their cells. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/06/2013. (kcs)
June 28, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to transport the Plaintiff Mr. Thomas Steven Flaherty to the Evidentiary Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/28/2013. (kcs)
January 15, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, as moot, 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/15/2013. (kcs)
January 7, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/07/2013. (kcs)
August 30, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/30/2012. (kcs)
August 17, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and recommended disposition. Plaintiff may proceed with his excessive force claim against defendant Cox; dismissing all other claims and defendants are dismissed, without prejudice; directing the clerk's offi ce to prepare a summons for defendant Cox, and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this order on him through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. If defendant Cox is no longer an ADC employee, then the individual responding to service shall file his last known private mailing address under seal. It is further certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a (3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/17/12. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery G Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone L Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Steven Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?