Morris v. Does

Plaintiff: Eugene Morris
Defendant: John Does
Case Number: 2:2012cv00146
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion filed by Eugene Morris. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/30/2014. (ks)
July 8, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 24 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; pltf's complaint 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice; all pending motions are denied as moot 37 ; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/8/13. (vjt)
October 19, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to identify the "Doe" Defendants and file a Motion for Service that includes the full name and proper mailing address for each "Doe" Defendant within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/19/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?