Winston v. Harmon

Plaintiff: Charles A Winston
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Case Number: 2:2012cv00147
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing Winston's 2 Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/2014. (ks)
July 31, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 62 Partial Recommended Disposition. Winston's Motion for a preliminary injunction, as amended, 56 and 57 , and as supplemented, 61 is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2014. (jak)
February 25, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In conformity with Local Rule 83.7, Monte Darrel Estes is hereby appointed to represent Plaintiff Charles Winston. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Mr. Estes a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/25/2014. (ks)
January 21, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Danyelle Jones Walker as counsel for the plaintiff; the Clerk is directed to send Ms. Walker a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 01/21/2014. (rhm)
January 14, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relieving Pamela D. Gilbert from her representation of Mr. Winston. The Court will promptly appoint new counsel to represent Mr. Winston.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/14/2014. (ks)
January 6, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Pamela D. Gilbert as counsel for the plaintiff; the Clerk is directed to send Ms. Gilbert a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/6/2014. (ks)
October 16, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Winston's deliberate indifference and retaliation claims remain. Winston's claims against Defendants in their official capacities for money damages are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/13. (kpr)
September 5, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U. S. Marshal to serve summons and complaints 2 4 on defts Harmon and Harris without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/5/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?