Banks v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Banks
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw, USA, John Does, Cuccio, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Grahm and Hoye
Case Number: 2:2012cv00150
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts' 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/25/13. (vjt)
November 30, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file, within 15 days of the entry of this Order, a response to the 17 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment abd 16 Brief in Support filed by Hoye, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Grahm, Timothy C Outlaw, Cuccio, USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/30/12. (kpr)
November 13, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts John Does, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Outlaw, Hoye, and USA are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint for failure to state a claim; pltf's allegations of unconstitutional conditions of confinement are also DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/13/12. (vjt)
September 7, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Dr. Cuccio and Ms. Grahm. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on the defts., the U.S. Attorney, and the U.S. Attorney General, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/7/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?