Spencer v. Milholland et al

Plaintiff: Addones Spencer
Defendant: Meyer, John Doe, M Sheldon and M Milholland
Case Number: 2:2012cv00209
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge, granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by C Samuels. Spencer's claims against Samuels are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2013. (mcz)
March 13, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Judge Deere's well-reasoned 27 Partial Report and Recommendations as the Court's own opinion; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss; and dismissing Spencer's claims against Sheldon and Meyer without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/13/2013. (dmn)
January 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting 9 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The John Doe plaintiff wishes to sue is C. Samuels. The Clerk is directed to adjust the docket accordingly. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/22/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Milholland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Milholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addones Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?