Hastings v. Oxner et al

Plaintiff: Michael Hastings
Defendant: Jackie Oxner, E Clay, Barnes and William Miles
Case Number: 2:2012cv00212
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 84 Order dismissing a portion of Plaintiff's claims on summary judgment, and the stipulation of dismissal, 112 , it is hereby considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/29/2015. (jak)
February 10, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 81 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge; granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sheriff Oxner and Captain Guynes; 66 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Clay, Barnes and Miles is granted in part and denied in part; The official capacity claims for monetary damages, deliberate indifference to medical needs claims, retaliation claims and verbal harassment claim are dismissed, and Defendant Miles is dismissed as a defendant. Summary judgment on the due process claims against Defendants Barnes and Clay is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/10/2014. (mcz)
January 7, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service is appropriate for the Defendants Jack Oxner, E. Clay, Captain Barnes, and William Miles; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of 1 Plaintiff's Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/7/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. Oxner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Oxner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?