Chance v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Franklin L Chance
Defendant: Jada Lawrence, Lisa Wilkens, Dany Burl, Curtis L Rolfe, III, Lathan Ester, Dequincey Smith, Tameka Cody, Larry May and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 2:2012cv00228
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT in favor of Danny Burl, Lathan Ester, Tameka Cody re 43 Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/15/14. (kpr)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 8 Answer to Complaint. Deft Danny Burl has supplied his correct name. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/13. (kpr)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing defendants to file a response to the 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint filed by Franklin L Chance within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/15/13. (kpr)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 4 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing plaintiff's claims against defts Hobbs and May, Wilkins, Smith and Lawrence. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/13. (kpr)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER finding service appropriate for defts Burl, Rolfe, Ester, and Cody. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal is to serve summons and the Complaint on defts in care of the Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, R 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/10/13. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chance v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jada Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dany Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis L Rolfe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lathan Ester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dequincey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tameka Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin L Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?