Scott v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Deverick Scott
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Danny Burl, Dexter Payne, R T Ball, T Washington, R Barden, Bogan/Hall, Tiffany Sparkman, Zonnie Burnell, Sheridan, Campbell, Gardner, Corizon, Wendy Kelly, Horton and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 2:2012cv00229
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 127 as untimely. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/26/2016. (jak)
August 8, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes Scott's motion to enforce damages, 213 . The Court would appreciate an update from Washington and Barden about payment by 8/15/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2016. (jak)
October 22, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT: Following the bench trial on 16 September 2015, the Court found in favor of Janice Bogan-Hall and Tiffany Sparkman on Scott's failure to protect claims against them. Scott's claims agains these two defendants are dismissed with prejudice. The Court found in favor of Scott on his failure to protect claim against Barden and awarded compensatory damages of $250.00. The Court also found in favor of Scott on his excessive force claim against Washington and awarded com pensatory damages of $500.00. Scott is not entitled to declaratory relief. The evidence did not warrant any punitive damages. The Court also enters Judgment for Scott against Barden and Washington, jointly, and severally, for a total attorney&# 039;s fee of $1,125.00. One dollar of the damages awarded against each of them shall be applied to satisfy Scott's attorney's fees. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.39% annum from 18 September 2015 until this Judgment is paid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/2015. (jak)
September 18, 2015 188 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Court enters Judgment for Bogan-Hall and Sparkman on Scott's claims against them. The Court enters Judgment for Deverick Scott against Roosevelt Barden for $250, for Scott against Tyrone Washington for $500, for Scott aga inst Barden and Roosevelt for a reasonable attorney's fee and costs as the Court may later award. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.39% per annum from today until this Judgment is paid in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2015. (jak)
September 10, 2015 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/2015. (jak)
July 24, 2015 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This older case is set for a bench trial on 14 September 2015. It is first out. And it will be tried then. The Court requests that counsel confer now and file a joint report by 29th July 2015. Please specify the number of witnesses and approximate number of trial days needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2015. (jak)
September 4, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 156 Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 131 the ADC Defendants' motion for summary judgment; dismissing with prejudice all claims against Defendants Burl, Ball, Payne and Kelly; granting 134 the Medical D efendants' motion for summary judgment; dismissing with prejudice all claims against Defendants Burnell, Sherman, Campbell, Horton, and Corizon; denying without prejudice 119 Scott's motion for summary judgment; and, requesting that Magis trate Judge Ray appoint counsel to try the case for Scott. An in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/4/2014. (thd) (Docket text modified on 9/4/2014 to include the dismissal of ADC defendants.) (thd).
April 23, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 150 Partial Report and Recommendations. Scott's 140 Motion for preliminary injunction is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/23/2014. (jak)
March 11, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, separate Responses to 131 and 134 , as well as separate Statements of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions set forth in this Order; and Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in 131 and 134 be deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/11/2014. (kcs)
January 24, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendants must respond to Plaintiff's 12/26/2013 Requests for Production of Documents ( 125 Ex. B) on or before 2/7/2014. Defendant must file dispositive motions on or before 3/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/24/2014. (kcs)
January 14, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 112 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying103] 107 Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/14/14. (kpr)
January 7, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 114 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance for a Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/07/2014. (kcs)
October 1, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 91 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part defts' 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. Scott's claim against Charlotte Gardner is dismissed without prejudice for failure to properly exhaust his administrative remedies. All Scott's claims against the other Defendants remain. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/13. (kpr)
August 6, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 87 Partial Report and Recommendations as the Court's own Order. Scott's 71 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. An informa pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2013. (dmn)
June 17, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, directing the Plaintiff, within 30 days to file a Response to the medical Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 73 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1., and the i nstructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/17/2013. (kcs)
June 4, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 60 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's 55 Motion for Default Judgment against Washington is denied; Washington's belated answer due 6/14/2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/4/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deverick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Barden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogan/Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zonnie Burnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?