Montgomery v. Payne et al

Plaintiff: Johnathan Montgomery
Defendant: B Woodard, D Payne and Ford
Case Number: 2:2012cv00236
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 76 Memorandum and Order that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/10/2014. (srw)
February 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 6 proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; dismissing plaintiff's claims against Sargent B. Woodward for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; and dismissing him as a defendant in this action. To the extent that plaintiff seeks his early release, such relief is not available under § 1983. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/7/2013. (kdr)
January 8, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defendants. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/8/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?