Winston v. Payne et al

Plaintiff: Charles A Winston
Defendant: Wiggins, Dexter Payne, Valerie Westbrook, Gay, Marcus I Etherly and Branscomb
Case Number: 2:2012cv00237
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 54 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/2014. (jak)
February 14, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 49 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety. Plaintiff's 47 motion for preliminary injunction is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/14/2014. (ks)
May 3, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted in part and denied in part; the motion is granted with respect to pltf's claims against them in their official capacities, and those claims are dismissed; the motion is denied in all other respects; pltf's 16 Motion to Supplement the complaint is granted, and the proposed amendment is deemed filed concurrently with the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/3/13. (vjt)
February 20, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Charles A Winston. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for deft Infirmary Supervisor Branscomb, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on deft, in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/20/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus I Etherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?