Namer v. USA

Plaintiff: David Namer
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2013cv00003
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 83 Order entered in this matter on this date, the Court adopts the 59 Proposed Findings and Recommendations submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe. Accordingly, the Court denies 33 Mr. Namer's motion for summary judgment, grants the 34 government's motion for summary judgment, and dismisses with prejudice this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/23/2015. (rhm)
July 24, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 59 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in part; giving Mr. Namer until 10/15/2014 to file the opinions of any expert witness he may obtain with the Court for review in connection with the 33 34 motions for summary judgment; denying 64 motion for recusal and denying as moot 65 motion to compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/24/2014. (rhm)
May 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying 14 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/29/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Namer v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Namer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?