Finley v. Cross

Petitioner: Thomas Finley
Respondent: Anthony Hayes
Case Number: 2:2013cv00016
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration ; finding as moot 47 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/14/14. (kpr)
December 3, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 38 the Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; and dismissing this complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/3/2013. (kdr)
January 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IN ENTIRETY 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION to Substitute Party (Warden Anthony Haynes) filed by James Cross, Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier referral terminated. Case transferred to United States District Court for Eastern DIstrict Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 1/28/2013. (kar) [Transferred from ilsd on 1/29/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Hayes
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?