Stiger v. Haynes

Plaintiff: Thomas Harold Stiger
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Case Number: 2:2013cv00025
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying MOTION for Certificate of Appealability re: 36 Notice of Appeal by Thomas Harold Stiger because the Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/04/2013. (jak)
October 7, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Reconsideration re 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Clerk is directed to mail Petitioner a copy of the report and recommendations. The Petitioner has up to and including 14 days from the date of this order in which to file objections to the report and recommendations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/7/13. (kpr)
July 31, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 Report and Recommendations; therefore, Mr. Stiger's Petition 1 and Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 8 are DISMISSED with prejudice; the requested relief is denied and any pending motions are denied as moot 25 27 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/31/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiger v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Harold Stiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Represented By: Jamie Goss Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?