Clarke v. Federal Transfer Center et al
Plaintiff: Tibal Clarke
Defendant: Does, Ella Taylor, Jerald Jones, Kathleen Maples, H Matos, Nader Peikar, Outlaw, Amy Barker, Jack Vituitsky, Cathie Winkler and USA
Case Number: 2:2013cv00026
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 138 joint motion to dismiss with prejudice. The Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter for a period of 90 days from the date of this Order to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. The parties may move for an extension of time for the Court to retain jurisdiction if such an extension becomes necessary. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 04/07/2016. (rhm)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 127 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITION in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 107 motion for summary judgment; dismissing with prejudic e plaintiff Tibal Clarke's Bivens claims against Ella Taylor, Amy Barker, and Kathleen Maples; allowing Mr. Clarke to proceed with his Bivens claims against Dr. Matos and Dr. Peikar and his Federal Tort Claim Act negligence claim against the United States of America; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from the Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/30/2015. (rhm)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 81 motion to dismiss and 83 88 motions for summary judgment; dismissing without prejudice Mr. Clarke's claims against Mr. Outlaw; and dismissing with prejudice Mr. Clarke's claims against Mr. Vitvitsky and Ms. Winkler. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Opinion and Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/29/2014. (rhm)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file on or before 3/24/2014 his Response to Defendant Outlaw's Motion to Dismiss 81 . Plaintiff is advised that if he fails to timely do so, his claims against Defendant Outlaw will be dismissed, without prejudice; and Plaintiff may, if he so chooses, file Supplemental Responses to Defendant Vitvisky's and Winkler's Motions for Summary Judgment 83 and 88 on or before 3/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/10/2014. (kcs)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re 56 Order directing the plaintiff to provide names and addresses for the John Doe defendants. Mr. Clarke has not filed a motion for service; therefore, defendants Does and Jones are dismissed without prejudice due to a lack of service. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/16/13. (kpr)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that Defendant Winkler 55 is not in default and that her Answer and Substituted Answer (Docs. #57 & #60) are timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/19/2013. (kcs)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 14 Report and Recommendation, Therefore, the Report and Recommendation, as supplemented herein, is ADOPTED; Plaintiffs claims against FTC-Oklahoma City and FCC- Forrest City and against the individu al Defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED; Plaintiffs claim against Defendant Walker in his individual capacity is DISMISSED and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/12/13. (jw, ) [Transferred from okwd on 2/12/2013.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. Federal Transfer Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nader Peikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Vituitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathie Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tibal Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?