Scott v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Deverick Scott
Defendant: Ball, Campbell, Lathan Esther, Arkansas Department of Correction, Ray Hobbs, Larry May, Wendy Kelly, Raymond Naylor, D Burl, Claudia Harris, Kelly and Corizon Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv00031
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge; Plaintiff's claims against defendant Don Ball are dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice in all other respects. Plaintiff's 97 Motion for TRO is denied as moot following the filing of his objections. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivilous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/2014. (mcz)
February 6, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 83 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting 71 defendants' motion for summary judgment; and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Campbell and Iko, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/6/2014. (kdr)
September 6, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 40 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting 37 38 plaintiff's motions to amend and to consolidate, to the extent that the clerk is directed to file Doc. No. 38 as plaintiff's amended complaint, and plaintiff is allowed to proceed solely on the claims raised therein against defendants Ball, Campbell, and Ikko; and denying 35 defendant Geraldine Campbell's motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/6/2013. (kdr)
May 31, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; allowing the plaintiff to proceed only with his claims that defendants Claudia Harris, Campbell, Ball, Wendy Kelly, and Major Kelly denied him adequate medical care; dismi ssing, with prejudice, all of plaintiff's other claims; and removing as party defendants, the Arkansas Department of Correction, Ray Hobbs, Larry May, Raymond Naylor, D. Burl, Lathan Esther, and Corizon Medical Services Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/31/2013. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lathan Esther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deverick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?