Castro v. FCI - Forrest City et al

Plaintiff: Jorge A Castro
Defendant: Jane Doe, Mark A Sheldon, Federal Bureau of Prisons and FCI - Forrest City
Case Number: 2:2013cv00068
Filed: May 23, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 36 Opinion and Order entered separately today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/21/2014. (ks)
February 7, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing claims against defendant Jane Doe without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal of this Order would not be taken in food faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/2014. (ks)
February 3, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response and a separate statement of disputed facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order to 24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants War den Anthony Haynes and Lt. Mark Sheldon or alternatively, for summary judgment. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/03/2014. (kcs)
October 28, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts FCI-FC medical staff, FCI-FC, and the Federal Bureau of Prisons are dismissed with prejudice; pltf may proceed with failure to protect claim against defts Sheldon, Haynes, and Doe; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint 1 7 8 , and this Order on defts Sheldon and Haynes, the U.S. Attorney, and the U.S. Attorney General without prepayment of fees and costs; pltf is directed to file, within 90 days of the entry of this Order, a motion for service containing deft Doe's full and correct name. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/13. (vjt)
October 7, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to send a copy of the 8/29/2013 Order 9 and the 8/30/2013 Recommended Partial Disposition 10 to Plaintiff at the Big Sandy Penitentiary. Plaintiff has until 10/21/2013 to file an objections to the Recommended Partial Disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/07/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. FCI - Forrest City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI - Forrest City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?