Birts v. Haynes

Plaintiff: Terry Dean Birts
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Case Number: 2:2013cv00129
Filed: October 3, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/08/2014. (rhm)
June 13, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 20 Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/13/2014. (ks)
November 20, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 on the Respondent and Arkansas Attorney General by regular mail. Respondent shall file an answer within 40 days of the date of service of this Petition, exclusive of the date of service. Respondent shall also address Mr. Birts's Motion 8 in its response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/20/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birts v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Dean Birts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?