McAlphin v. Obi et al

Plaintiff: James McAlphin
Defendant: N Obi, Ball, G Campbell, Kitrell, John Delk, Charlotte Gardner, Richard E D'Anna, Corizon, Dunn, Roland Anderson and Larry May
Case Number: 2:2013cv00145
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: McAlphin's official capacity claims are dismissed without prejudice; McAlphin's claims against Kitrell, Delk, Gardener, D'Anna, Corizon, Dunn, Anderson, May, Hobbs, Kelly, and Ball are dismissed without prejudice; McAlphin� 39;s heat exposure claims against Obi-Okoye are dismissed without prejudice; McAlphin's claims against the ADC are dismissed with prejudice; and all other claims against Obi-Okoye and Campbell are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 04/21/2015. (rhm)
July 28, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Reconsideration. McAlphin' s new requests that a sleep apnea test be conducted and that he be housed in temperatures less than eighty degrees are beyond the scope of his original motion. They should be raised in a separate motion if McAlphin still seeks relief. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)
June 12, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. McAlphin's 2 Motion is denied. His 40 Motion for a ruling is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2014. (jak)
January 23, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 Partial Report and Recommendations. The Court has rescreened McAlphin' s amended complaint and declines to reinstate Kitrell, Delk, D' Anna, Dunn, and Corizon, who were previously dismissed. McAlphin' s claims ag ainst the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed with prejudice. His claims against Hobbs and Kelly are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. McAlphin' s claims against Obi, Ball, and Campbell remain. Motion to amend 13 , is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/14. (kpr)
December 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 proposed findings and recommendations; dismissing without prejudice claims for damages against Defendants in their official capacities; and dismissing without prejudice claims against Kitrell, Delk, Gardner, D' Anna, Corizon, Dunn, Anderson, and May for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/04/2013. (rhm)
November 13, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service is appropriate for Defendants N. Obi, Dr. Ball, and G. Campbell; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for these Defendants; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of 4 Plaintiff's Complaint and 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and summons on these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore; and directing the Defendants to file their Response to 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/13/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAlphin v. Obi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McAlphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Obi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E D'Anna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?