Mid-Missouri Spray Service Inc v. South Delta Aviation Inc

Plaintiff: Mid-Missouri Spray Service Inc
Defendant: South Delta Aviation Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv00150
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Mid-Missouri Spray Services, Inc.'s complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2015. (jak)
March 17, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Discovery is reopened, at Mid-Missouri's request, until 17 April 2015. South Delta's motion, 23 , to file a dispositive motion is granted. Motion due by 1 May 2015. The Court requests that both parties follow the motion/response procedures for summary judgment in the Scheduling Order, 7 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/17/2015. (jak)
February 27, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the trial in this matter to 13 July 2015. This is a second-out setting. All the pre-trial filings are done, which the Court appreciates. We'll have a hearing on a mutually convenient date between now and trial to handle the motion in limine and instructional issues. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-Missouri Spray Service Inc v. South Delta Aviation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Missouri Spray Service Inc
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Delta Aviation Inc
Represented By: David W. Cahoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?