Wearing v. Haynes

Plaintiff: Rashad A Wearing
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Case Number: 2:2013cv00163
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 58 proposed findings and supplemental recommended disposition; this petition for a writ of habeas corpus is denied and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/16. (tjb)
May 19, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 34 Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this 28 U.S.C. § 2241 action is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/2015. (ks)
January 29, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Petitioner to file, on or before 2/28/2014, a Reply, addressing Respondent's arguments for dismissal in 9 Response to Habeas Petition filed by Anthony Haynes. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/29/2014. (kcs)
January 24, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to refund to Petitioner the second $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/24/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wearing v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashad A Wearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?