Whitehead v. Horton et al

Plaintiff: Billy Whitehead
Defendant: Debra Horton and Ray Gruff
Case Number: 2:2014cv00048
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Whitehead's claims against Horton, Griffith, and Obi are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Whitehead's deliberate-indifference claim against Simmons is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/26/2015. (jak)
March 17, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed recommendation, 24 . Dr. Simmons's motions to dismiss, which is part of 18 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/17/2015. (jak)
January 7, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Plaintiff an additional 14 days from the date of this Order's entry to file his response to Defendant Simmons's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/7/2015. (srw)
June 19, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Whitehead's claims against Horton, Griffith, Obi, and Campbell are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Whitehead's deliberate indifference c laim against Simmons remains. Ray Griffith and Ray Gruff are the same person. The Court therefore directs the Clerk to terminate Ray Gruff as a defendant. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Gruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?