Valez-Santos v. Rivera

Plaintiff: Melvin Omar Valez-Santos
Defendant: C V Rivera
Case Number: 2:2014cv00105
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court declines to vacate its second Judgment. But the Court construes Valez-Santos's latest filing, 23 , as a motion to reopen the time for appeal, which is granted for good cause. Valez-Santos has until 12 June 2015 to file a notice of appeal. On the merits, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Valez-Santos hasn't made a substantial showing that his constitutional rights were denied. As the Court has explained, 19 , Magistrate Judge Deere had authority to make recommendations in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/12/2015. (jak)
April 20, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Request. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Valez-Santos another copy of No. 19 and No. 20 and a copy of the docket sheet, along with this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2015. (jak)
December 19, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Valez-Santo's petition for want of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valez-Santos v. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Omar Valez-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C V Rivera
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?