Carter v. Honeycutt

Plaintiff: Robert D Carter
Defendant: Alvin Honeycutt
Case Number: 2:2015cv00030
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Carter's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/30/2016. (jak)
July 8, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants must file a complete condensed transcript of Carter's deposition, 19 at 2. The regular transcript will do if the condensed one is not in hand. Please file the complete transcript as soon as practicable. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/2016. (jak)
June 3, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Carter hasn't responded to Defendants' motion for summary judgment, 23 . If he wants to be heard on the motion, then he must respond by 17 June 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/3/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?