Murray v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Bruce Murray
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00031
Filed: March 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Murray's complaint is dismissed without prejudice on conditions, 39 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2016. (jak)
January 5, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with conditions 39 Motion for nonsuit. Motion for summary judgment, 31 , denied without prejudice as moot. The Scheduling Order, 22 , is suspended. The March 2016 trial is cancelled. Union Pacific's cost list due by 12 January 2016. Murray's response due within three calendar days after the railroad files. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/5/2016. (jak)
June 11, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. A reasonable member of the public, or of the bar, would not see an impropriety in Mr. Shelton's representing Murray against the Railroad in this case: all Mr. Shelton's prior work for Union Pacific involved personal injuries on the job or at grade crossings, not employment discrimination. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/11/2015. (jak)
May 20, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/20/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Murray
Represented By: William Daniel Shelton, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert D. Trammell(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Robben Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?