Webb v. Cantrell et al

Plaintiff: Brian J N Webb
Defendant: Cantrell, C Wright and John Does
Case Number: 2:2015cv00069
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 80 Partial Report and Recommendations. Webb's claims against Sell and Wright will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust and claims against the unnamed defendant Bishop are dismissed without prejudice. An informa pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11 July 2016. (plm)
June 29, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 76 the unopposed partial recommendation; granting 63 Bishop's Motion to Dismiss; and dismissing her, without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/28/2016. (kdr)
March 8, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 74 unopposed partial recommendation; and granting Kittrell's 24 motion for summary judgment. Webb's claims against Kittrell are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/8/2016. (ljb)
November 10, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining 37 Recommendation without prejudice. The Court refers the motion for a hearing, 38 , to Magistrate Judge Harris for consideration. If she concludes a hearing would be fruitful, then she should hold one and file a new recommendation, supplemented with what is learned at the hearing. If not, then she will submit a new recommendation on the pending motions, [24[ & 38 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Cantrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J N Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?