Franklin v. Washington

Plaintiff: Frank Franklin
Defendant: R Washington
Case Number: 2:2015cv00076
Filed: March 3, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2017. (jak)
February 27, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 47 Partial Recommendation and overruling 48 Franklin's objections. Franklin's 43 Motion for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/27/2017. (jak)
June 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 34 Partial Recommendation. Washington's motion to dismiss, 27 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/3/2016. (jak)
August 31, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 17 Recommendation; denying 16 Motion for Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/31/2015. (ks)
May 26, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying case pending this Court's receipt of the Court of Appeals' mandate in Franklin v. Hobbs, No. 2:13-cv-106-JTR. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/26/2015. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?