Slayton v. Martinez et al

Plaintiff: Bryan Edward Slayton
Defendant: Martinez, Relvas, Reed, Ward and Lloyd
Case Number: 2:2015cv00085
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 19 Proposed Findings and Recommendations; dismissing Plaintiff's claims against defendant Ward without prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/15/2016. (rhm)
January 20, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days of this order's entry, Plaintiff must provide a full name for Defendant Ward and a viable address if he is able. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/20/2016. (lej)
January 6, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and denying in part 4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Mr. Slayton's claim against Mr. Lloyd for an alleged violation of his Fourth Amendment rights is not dismissed at this stage of the proceedings. However, Mr. Slayton's claims under the Fourth Amendment against separate defendants Martinez, Reed, and Relvas are dismissed without prejudice. Mr. Slayton's claim that his due process rights were violated because he was denied the opportunity to call witnesses at his disciplinary hearing is not dismissed at this stage of the proceedings. In all other respects, the Court adopts the Recommendations. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/06/2016. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slayton v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Edward Slayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relvas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?