Baker & Taylor LLC v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc et al

Plaintiff: Baker & Taylor LLC
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc, David B Griffin, Roxanna S Griffin, Griffin Family Investment Company One Limited Partnership, Griffin Grain Inc, Desha Farms Inc, Griffin Management Trust, Griffin Irrevocable Trust One, Dixie Farms Inc, DLB Inc and Brooks Griffin Family Foundation
Case Number: 2:2015cv00093
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The 12 amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 04/19/2016. (rhm)
January 29, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint report, 43 , noted and appreciated. The stay is lifted and the Court confirms MetLife's dismissal with prejudice. And the Court grants the remaining parties' request to leave the case on hold until April. The stay is reinstated. Unless some party requests some relief before 19 April 2016, the Court will lift it and enter judgment dismissing Baker & Taylor's amended complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2016. (jak)
December 28, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 37 Joint Motion. The motions to dismiss, 21 , 22 , and 24 , are denied without prejudice - the settlement moots them. If the settlement is not consummated, then the Court will reinstate the motions (and all related fil ings) and decide them. Joint status report due by 29 January 2016. If by then the land sales have closed, and the payments have been made as planned, the Court is inclined to dismiss with prejudice at that point. The Court will, though, retain jurisdiction for a few months to cover the preference period and to make sure the deal doesn't unravel. Case stayed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/28/2015. (jak)
September 1, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Baker and Taylor's motion to file an unredacted response under seal, 28 , is granted. Please send a courtesy paper copy of this filing to chambers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/1/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker & Taylor LLC v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker & Taylor LLC
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David S. Mitchell, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Bennet J. Moskowitz(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Gavin B. Parsons(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen G. Rinehart(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Gary A. Barnes(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Martha Ruth Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanna S Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Family Investment Company One Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Grain Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desha Farms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Management Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Irrevocable Trust One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Farms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLB Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Griffin Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?