Breshears v. Steve et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Ray Breshears
Defendant: Jeffery Steve, Robert Floss, Amy Rowland and Patrick S Drummard
Case Number: 2:2015cv00119
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Court certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2016. (jak)
July 18, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion to reopen. If Breshears wants to pursue the claims the Court dismissed without prejudice, then he may refile them in a new lawsuit. But he can't skirt the PLRA' s payment requirements or the local rules by reopening a case that's been closed for six months. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2016. (jak)
January 12, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Breshears's claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction Transportation Unit are dismissed with prejudice. Breshears's remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2016. (jak)
November 3, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' motion to consolidate the third case, 2:15-cv-119 JM/JJV. The case filed first, Breshears v. Kelley et al, 5:15-cv-00149 DPM/JTR is designated as the lead case. All future papers must be filed in that case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2015. (jak)
August 28, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants Jeffery Steve and Robert Floss are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims relating to his hypoglycemia, hepa titis-c, and retaliation for filing this suit are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/28/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breshears v. Steve et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ray Breshears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Steve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick S Drummard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?