Coffey v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Kenny Coffey
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Rory Griffin, Robert Stevie, Steven Floss, CCS Solutions, Amy Rowland, Bret Butler and Tammy Kimble
Case Number: 2:2015cv00157
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 71 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/2017. (ljb) Modified on 6/27/2017 to correct typo (ljb).
February 3, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 59 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting the 39 motion for partial summary judgment filed by defendants CCS, Stieve, Flos s, Butler, and Kimble; and granting the 42 motion for partial summary judgment filed by defendants Kelley and Griffin. Coffey's claims against Stieve and Kimble are dismissed without prejudice, and any claims against CCS, Floss, and Butler, o ther than the exhausted claims identified in the recommendation, are dismissed without prejudice. Coffey's claims against Kelley are dismissed without prejudice, and any claims against Griffin, other than the exhausted claims identified in the recommendation, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/2017. (ljb)
June 15, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 48 findings and recommendation from Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris as this Court's findings in all respects; and denying the 16 motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by defendants Wendy Kelley and Rory Griffin. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/2016. (ljb)
April 4, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 33 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris; plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunction and for protective order are denied 4 . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/4/16. (tjb)
September 29, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the Helena Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/29/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffey v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Stevie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?