Manley v. DeVazier

Plaintiff: Shawn DeVazier Manley
Defendant: Thomas Bradley DeVazier
Case Number: 2:2015cv00164
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 26:6703
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 27 Motion for injunctive relief based on the parties' agreement on dealing with the IRS. 26 Motion to amend granted with a caveat: Mr. Autry must redact any personal confidential information from each line of each page of any exhibit. Clean copy of amended complaint with revised exhibit due by 5/17/2017. The Court seals 26 -3 because it contains personal confidential information. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/10/2017. (jak)
April 10, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Notice on settlement, and any joint request for partial dismissal, due by 4/21/2017. New motion to amend, with the proposed complaint limited to the remaining claim, also due by that date. The current motion to amend, 18 , is denied without p rejudice. By 4/28/2017 DeVazier must serve the IRS or file a notice that he will not serve the IRS in this case. In the alternative, by that same date the parties must notify the Court that they've arranged a limited Power of Attorney for representation before the IRS. We need to know soon whether the IRS will be involved in this case. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2017. (jak)
December 22, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating these two cases. 2:15-cv-164 DPM will be the lead case. The 4 Initial Scheduling Order is vacated. A new one will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/22/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manley v. DeVazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn DeVazier Manley
Represented By: Edward T. Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bradley DeVazier
Represented By: Richard F. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?