Wilburn v. Mansfield et al

Plaintiff: Billy V Wilburn
Defendant: Mansfield, Key and Pittman
Case Number: 2:2015cv00176
Filed: October 27, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 28 and 44 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and this cause of action is dismissed with prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/25/2017. (mcz)
March 10, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide a viable address for Defendant Pittman within 30 days of this order's entry so service may be attempted a third time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/10/2016. (lej)
January 20, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall alter the docket to reflect that Defendant Mansfield is "Melissa K. Mansfield"; Defendant Keys is "Yavonda Keys"; Defendant Pittman is "Jennifer Pittman"; and Defendant Simmons is "Aric Wa de Simmons". The Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendants Pittman and Mansfield at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/20/2016. (lej)
October 29, 2015 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff must submit either (1) the statutory filing fee of $400; or (2) a properly completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the detention center at which he is confined within 30 days of the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/29/2015. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilburn v. Mansfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy V Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?