Harmon v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Dexter Harmon
Defendant: C Jackson and W McDaniels
Case Number: 2:2015cv00187
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER adopting the 92 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety; granting Defendants' 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint; and dismissing without prejudice the state law negligence claims. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/24/2017. (ljb)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER adopting the 77 Recommendation in its entirety as my findings in all respects; and dismissing Defendant Cordaieo Jackson with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/08/2017. (rhm)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Recommendation 48 from United States Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney; plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 42 is denied. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/4/16. (tjb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Jackson
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?